05/04/2012 | House Calendar Number 491 | |||
05/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule C | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 4577 | |||
05/02/2012 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 4518 | |||
05/02/2012 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 4444 | |||
04/02/2012 | File Number 191 | |||
04/02/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 180 | |||
04/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/02/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/15/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |