|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-190
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/28/2012
|
House Calendar Number 458
|
|
|
|
04/28/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 4074
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3995
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
File Number 18
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 60
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|