05/31/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/18/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/15/2012 | Public Act 12-69 | |||
05/08/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/08/2012 | House Passed | |||
05/08/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/24/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/18/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 320 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
03/07/2012 | File Number 16 | |||
03/07/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 57 | |||
03/07/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/01/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/12 5:00 PM | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |