04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 321 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/11/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
03/29/2012 | File Number 162 | |||
03/29/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 168 | |||
03/29/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/15/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/01/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
02/24/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |