04/11/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
03/20/2012 | File Number 47 | |||
03/20/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 82 | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/20/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/05/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/02/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/17/2012 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |