|
05/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 493
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4536
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4532
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
File Number 404
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 294
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|