05/07/2012 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/01/2012 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/01/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/01/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/01/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/01/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/26/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3966 | |||
04/16/2012 | File Number 419 | |||
04/16/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 318 | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/12/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/12/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/08/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health | |||
02/23/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |