06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/01/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/30/2012 | Special Act 12-6 | |||
05/09/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/09/2012 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 431 | |||
04/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3298 | |||
03/27/2012 | File Number 119 | |||
03/27/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 114 | |||
03/27/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/27/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/23/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |