05/02/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/26/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
04/25/2012 | Public Act 12-6 | |||
04/18/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
04/18/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 322 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/11/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/04/2012 | File Number 263 | |||
04/04/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 213 | |||
04/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/04/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/23/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/09/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/08/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health | |||
02/23/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |