05/31/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/18/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/11/2012 | Public Act 12-43 | |||
05/04/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/04/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/30/2012 | House Calendar Number 473 | |||
04/30/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/20/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/21/2012 | File Number 67 | |||
03/21/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 86 | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/12 5:00 PM | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |