|
06/06/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Public Act 12-71
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 494
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3989
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
File Number 405
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 292
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|