06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/01/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/30/2012 | Public Act 12-201 | |||
05/09/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | House Passed | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 412 | |||
04/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 327 | |||
04/10/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 259 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/10/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/13/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/13/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/08/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | |||
02/23/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |