04/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 413 | |||
04/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 328 | |||
04/10/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 265 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/10/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/26/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/26/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health | |||
02/23/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |