04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/19/2012 | File Number 31 | |||
03/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 71 | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/07/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/06/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |