04/17/2012 | File Number 465 | |||
04/17/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 337 | |||
04/17/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | |||
03/02/2012 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |