05/08/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/08/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3898 | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
03/26/2012 | File Number 106 | |||
03/26/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 109 | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/02/2012 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |