05/02/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/26/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
04/25/2012 | Public Act 12-8 | |||
04/19/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
04/19/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 324 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/11/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/02/2012 | File Number 198 | |||
04/02/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 186 | |||
04/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/02/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/23/2012 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |