|
06/06/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Public Act 12-72
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 496
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4331
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
File Number 32
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 73
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|