|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Public Act 12-191
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/28/2012
|
House Calendar Number 463
|
|
|
|
04/28/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3460
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
File Number 33
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 74
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|