05/09/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/09/2012 | Public Act 12-38 | |||
05/03/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/03/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/28/2012 | House Calendar Number 464 | |||
04/28/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/26/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/26/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/18/2012 | File Number 519 | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 350 | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/15/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/08/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |