05/02/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/26/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
04/25/2012 | Public Act 12-9 | |||
04/19/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
04/19/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 325 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/11/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
03/19/2012 | File Number 34 | |||
03/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 75 | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/12/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |