|
05/07/2012
|
House Calendar Number 532
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
File Number 164
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 165
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|