04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/11/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/22/2012 | File Number 73 | |||
03/22/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 95 | |||
03/16/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/12/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/23/2012 | Public Hearing 02/27 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |