|
06/06/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Public Act 12-73
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
House Calendar Number 475
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4013
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3912
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
File Number 109
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 107
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|