|
05/07/2012
|
House Calendar Number 528
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4810
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
File Number 19
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 58
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|