04/27/2012 | House Calendar Number 446 | |||
04/27/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/25/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/16/2012 | File Number 421 | |||
04/16/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 310 | |||
04/16/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/30/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |