04/11/2012 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/21/2012 | File Number 70 | |||
03/21/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 84 | |||
03/21/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/21/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/13/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/13/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/02/2012 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |