05/03/2012 | Bill Passed Temporarily | |||
05/03/2012 | House Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/30/2012 | House Calendar Number 476 | |||
04/30/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/27/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4063 | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 331 | |||
04/10/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 263 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/10/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/22/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/02/2012 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |