04/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 432 | |||
04/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 3551 | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3540 | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3441 | |||
04/05/2012 | File Number 271 | |||
04/05/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 228 | |||
04/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/05/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |