05/31/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/18/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/11/2012 | Public Act 12-45 | |||
05/04/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/04/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/30/2012 | House Calendar Number 478 | |||
04/30/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/23/2012 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/23/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/20/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/12/2012 | File Number 406 | |||
04/12/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 295 | |||
04/05/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |