|
04/17/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
File Number 122
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 124
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|