|
05/09/2012
|
House Calendar Number 549
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
File Number 273
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 222
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|