05/01/2012 | Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
04/10/2012 | Rules Suspended | |||
04/05/2012 | File Number 274 | |||
04/05/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 223 | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/08/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
02/24/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |