|
05/08/2012
|
House Calendar Number 542
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5287
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
File Number 239
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 195
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|