05/31/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/18/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/11/2012 | Public Act 12-39 | |||
05/03/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/03/2012 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/03/2012 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 419 | |||
04/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3267 | |||
03/21/2012 | File Number 71 | |||
03/21/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 91 | |||
03/21/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/21/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/12/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/29/2012 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
02/28/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |