|
04/25/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Public Act 12-5
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,I
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule M 3172
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule L 3127
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule K 3126
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule J 3129
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule I 3190
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule H 3189
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule G 3124
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 3179
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 3175
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 3155
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 3122
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 3121
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 3120
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule I
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
House Calendar Number 240
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,I
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule I 3068
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 3034
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 3048
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 3030
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 3065
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 3058
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule C 3055
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3051
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3027
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
File Number 111
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 113
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|