|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-120
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 501
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4476
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
File Number 407
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 288
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|