05/07/2012 | Senate Recommitted to Education | |||
04/23/2012 | File Number 574 | |||
04/23/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 410 | |||
04/23/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/23/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/16/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 10:00 AM | |||
04/04/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/03/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/14/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |||
02/29/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |