|
05/07/2012
|
House Calendar Number 534
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
File Number 333
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 264
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|