05/07/2012 | House Calendar Number 535 | |||
05/07/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/07/2012 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
05/07/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/07/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |||
05/07/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4864 | |||
05/07/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4508 | |||
04/19/2012 | File Number 535 | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 380 | |||
04/19/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/02/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/02/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/02/2012 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
02/29/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |