06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/01/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/30/2012 | Public Act 12-206 | |||
05/09/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | House Passed | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/20/2012 | House Calendar Number 426 | |||
04/20/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 335 | |||
04/10/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 258 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/10/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/22/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/05/2012 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
03/02/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |