04/25/2012 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/17/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/16/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/03/2012 | File Number 242 | |||
04/03/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 206 | |||
03/28/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/19/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/05/2012 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
03/02/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |