|
06/15/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Public Act 12-153
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4662
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
File Number 575
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 412
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|