05/03/2012 | No New File by Committee on Environment | |||
05/03/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
05/03/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/03/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | File Number 576 | |||
04/23/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 413 | |||
04/16/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/12 10:00 AM | |||
04/03/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/07/2012 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
03/06/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |