04/24/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
04/02/2012 | File Number 202 | |||
04/02/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 175 | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/06/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |