04/18/2012 | Senate Recommitted to Banks | |||
04/05/2012 | File Number 279 | |||
04/05/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 219 | |||
04/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/05/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/20/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/20/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/06/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |