|
06/06/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Public Act 12-74
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
House Calendar Number 433
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 3556
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 3438
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 3427
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 3561
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 3392
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 3388
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3383
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3549
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
File Number 280
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 230
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|