05/05/2012 | House Calendar Number 514 | |||
05/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/03/2012 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/03/2012 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4126 | |||
04/16/2012 | File Number 425 | |||
04/16/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 315 | |||
04/16/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/28/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/06/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |