06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/01/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/30/2012 | Public Act 12-207 | |||
05/09/2012 | In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | House Passed | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/04/2012 | House Calendar Number 507 | |||
05/04/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |||
04/18/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/17/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/17/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |||
04/10/2012 | Rules Suspended | |||
04/05/2012 | File Number 281 | |||
04/05/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 233 | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/06/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |