05/07/2012 | Matter Pass Retained | |||
05/07/2012 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 5314 | |||
05/01/2012 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/01/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/01/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/01/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/01/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/17/2012 | File Number 471 | |||
04/17/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 328 | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2012 | Public Hearing 03/27 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |